Global Patent Index - EP 1103704 A2

EP 1103704 A2 2001-05-30 - Liquid cooled internal combustion engine with cylinder banks arranged in V form

Title (en)

Liquid cooled internal combustion engine with cylinder banks arranged in V form

Title (de)

Flüssigkeitsgekühlte Brennkraftmaschine mit zueinander geneigt angeordneten Zylinderbänken, insbesondere V-Motor

Title (fr)

Moteur à combustion refroidi par liquide avec les bancs-cylindres rangés en V

Publication

EP 1103704 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00122748 A

Priority

DE 19956358 A

Abstract (en)

The engine has coolant going into the exhaust-side cooling jackets (6, 6') and via cross-flow cylinder heads to the induction-side cooling jackets (7, 7'), then via breaks in the cylinder bank boundaries to an outflow line (15) in the vee cavity (8). This line incorporates the inflow line (9), from which coolant goes via vertical channels to the exhaust-side cooling jackets.

Abstract (de)

Für eine flüssigkeitsgekühlte Brennkraftmaschine mit zueinander geneigt angeordneten Zylinderbänken, insbesondere V-Motor, wird vorgeschlagen, ein abgasseitigen Kühlmänteln in den Zylinderbänken zugeführtes Kühlmittel über quer durchströmte Zylinderköpfe V-innenseitig ausgebildeten Kühlmänteln der Zylinderbänke zuzuführen, aus denen es über Durchbrechungen in Zylinderbankbegrenzungen in eine im V-Raum angeordnete Ablaufleitung abfließt, wobei in der mit einer Kühlmittelpumpe in Verbindung stehenden Ablaufleitung eine mit der Kühlmittelpumpe in Förderverbindung stehende Zulaufleitung angeordnet ist, aus der über Verteilkanäle an einem Gehäuseende das Kühlmittel den abgasseitigen Kühlmänteln zugeführt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 75/22; F02F 1/40; F02F 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/22 (2006.01); F02F 7/00 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 7/0012 (2013.01); F02B 75/22 (2013.01); F02F 2001/245 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4001140 C1 19910411

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103704 A2 20010530; EP 1103704 A3 20020515; EP 1103704 B1 20041222; DE 19956358 A1 20010531; ES 2231097 T3 20050516; US 6418886 B1 20020716

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171103

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171017

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-10-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2231097 T3

2005-04-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009021 P 20050127

2005-01-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-01-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-12-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI