Global Patent Index - EP 1103718 A2

EP 1103718 A2 2001-05-30 - Stroke adjustment between an actuator and a transmission element for a valve in a fuel injector

Title (en)

Stroke adjustment between an actuator and a transmission element for a valve in a fuel injector

Title (de)

Leerhubeinstellung zwischen einem Aktor und einem Übertragungselement eines Ventils in einem Kraftstoffinjektor

Title (fr)

Réglage de la course entre un actionneur et un élément de transmission pour une soupape dans un injecteur de combustible

Publication

EP 1103718 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00125706 A

Priority

DE 19956256 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves positioning a positioning drive (19) in a casing of a fuel injector (1) with a valve, whereby the positioning drive comprises an actuator (21) with an actuator casing (17) and a transmission element (35) arranged in the casing between the actuator and the valve, transferring a longitudinal movement of the actuator onto the valve. A plastic deformable spacer element (31) is inserted in the casing, which is compressed permanently according to the desired neutral lift of the valve. The actuator casing is fastened to the casing of the fuel injector, next to the spacer element.

Abstract (de)

Ein Stellantrieb 19 wird in einem Kraftstoffinjektor 1 positioniert, indem ein plastisch verformbares Abstandselement 31 in das Gehäuse des Kraftstoffinjektors eingelegt wird, das Abstandselement entsprechend dem gewünschten Leerhub des Ventils bleibend zusammengepresst wird, und an dem Abstandselement anliegend das Aktorgehäuse am Gehäuse des Kraftstoffinjektors befestigt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02; F02M 59/46; F02M 61/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0026 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 61/168 (2013.01); F02M 2200/701 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103718 A2 20010530; EP 1103718 A3 20030402; EP 1103718 B1 20050504; DE 19956256 A1 20010607; DE 19956256 B4 20040408

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091123

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081113

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081122

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060207

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010220 P 20050609

2005-06-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050504

2005-05-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-05-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030602

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 61/16 A

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI