Global Patent Index - EP 1103722 A2

EP 1103722 A2 2001-05-30 - Plunger type pump

Title (en)

Plunger type pump

Title (de)

Kolbenpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à piston

Publication

EP 1103722 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00125242 A

Priority

JP 33391999 A

Abstract (en)

In a plunger pump a communication passage (72) is arranged in a plug (64) for closing a cylinder storing hole (16). The plug (64) is movable relative to the cylinder assembly (24) by a spring. An O-ring (74) for preventing the leakage of a fuel from faces opposed to the cylinder assembly (24) and the plug (64) is attached to the plug (64). When the fuel pressure within a fuel passage (32) is equal to or lower than a predetermined pressure, the O-ring (74) comes in contact with the cylinder assembly (24) by the spring (80), and the fuel leakage from the above opposed faces is prevented by the O-ring (74). If the fuel pressure within the fuel passage (32) is equal to or higher than the predetermined pressure, part of the fuel is vented to the exterior to reduce fuel pressure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 53/16; F04B 53/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/06 (2006.01); F04B 9/04 (2006.01); F04B 53/00 (2006.01); F04B 53/12 (2006.01); F04B 53/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 53/166 (2013.01); F04B 53/127 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103722 A2 20010530; EP 1103722 A3 20030205; EP 1103722 B1 20060510; EP 1103722 B8 20061213; DE 60027841 D1 20060614; JP 2001153033 A 20010605

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071123

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060510

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061123

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061123

2007-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-04-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070213

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-08-11 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060811

2006-06-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MIKUNI CORPORATION

2006-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60027841 P 20060614

2006-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-05-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-05-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060510

2004-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040426

2003-10-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-02-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI