Global Patent Index - EP 1103723 A2

EP 1103723 A2 2001-05-30 - Fuel pump

Title (en)

Fuel pump

Title (de)

Kraftstoffpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à carburant

Publication

EP 1103723 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00125423 A

Priority

  • DE 10054590 A
  • DE 19956144 A

Abstract (en)

The fuel pump has a rotary pump wheel provided with paddle blades defining a number of chambers, cooperating with channels provided by the pump housing, for providing 2 concentric feed chambers (21,22), for feeding fuel from an inlet channel (18) to an outlet channel (19) leading to the engine and to a second outlet channel (20) leading to a suction pump.

Abstract (de)

Eine Kraftstoffpumpe (5) für ein Kraftfahrzeug mit einem zu einer Brennkraftmaschine führenden Auslaßkanal (19) und einem zu einer Saugstrahlpumpe führenden Anschluß (20) hat zwei voneinander getrennte Förderkammern (21, 22). Die Förderkammern (21, 22) umschließen einander konzentrisch. Hierdurch ist die Kraftstoffpumpe (5) besonders einfach aufgebaut und läßt sich kostengünstig fertigen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 5/005 (2013.01); F04D 5/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103723 A2 20010530; EP 1103723 A3 20020417; EP 1103723 B1 20030326; BR 0005528 A 20010807; ES 2194667 T3 20031201; US 6443693 B1 20020903

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091121

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110328

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2011-04-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110407

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091120

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091120

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-12-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-26 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1103723E

2003-08-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030711

2003-04-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-04-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50001537 P 20030430

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2003-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2002-05-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020318

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04D 5/00 A, 7F 02M 37/02 B

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI