Global Patent Index - EP 1103745 A1

EP 1103745 A1 2001-05-30 - NON-CONTACT TYPE SHAFT SEALING DEVICE

Title (en)

NON-CONTACT TYPE SHAFT SEALING DEVICE

Title (de)

BERÜHRUNGSLOSE WELLENABDICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ETANCHEITE D'ARBRE DE TYPE SANS CONTACT

Publication

EP 1103745 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99923942 A

Priority

JP 9903037 W

Abstract (en)

A non-contact type shaft sealing device comprising a rotary sealing ring (2) provided on the rotary shaft (1) of equipment to be shaft-sealed and a fixed sealing ring (9) disposed to axially face the rotary sealing ring, wherein the number of air supply holes (9b) formed in the fixed sealing ring (9) is 3 to 24, the hole diameters (d) of throttle mechanisms each provided in each air supply hole (9b) are DIAMETER 0.05 to 3mm and a non-dimensional amount, alpha =8hD/nd<2>, satisfies the relation, 1 alpha 200, where h: seal face gap D: shaft diameter, thereby ensuring a stable sealing property and minimizing the consumption of a barrier gas supplied through the air supply holes (9b). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16J 15/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16J 15/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16J 15/342 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0075540 A1 20001214; DE 69942770 D1 20101028; EP 1103745 A1 20010530; EP 1103745 A4 20051221; EP 1103745 B1 20100915; US 6505836 B1 20030114

INPADOC legal status


2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110607

2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69942770

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-02-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110607

2011-10-13 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69942770

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110616

2010-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69942770 P 20101028

2010-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080717

2008-05-07 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20010426

2008-05-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB LI

2005-12-21 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20051108

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE