Global Patent Index - EP 1103756 A2

EP 1103756 A2 2001-05-30 - Luminaire

Title (en)

Luminaire

Title (de)

Leuchte

Title (fr)

Luminaire

Publication

EP 1103756 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00124613 A

Priority

DE 29920775 U

Abstract (en)

The light has at least one lamp and a shade. The direction of the light emanating from the lamp can be adjusted. The lamp has an associated mirror (5) which can deflect the light emitted by the lamp. The lamp and/or the mirror can be adjusted.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Leuchte mit wenigstens einer Lampe (6,7,8). Um eine verbesserte Leuchte zu schaffen, bei der die Gefahr der Blendung reduziert ist, ist der Lampe (6,7,8) eine Abschirmung zugeordnet. Dabei kann ein Rohrelement (1) vorgesehen sein, in welchem die Lampe (6,7,8) angeordnet ist. Um die Strahlrichtung des von der Lampe (6,7) abgestrahlten Lichtes einzustellen, ist ein Spiegel (5) vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/06; F21V 3/02; F21V 7/00; F21V 13/10; F21V 14/02; F21V 14/04; F21V 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 1/00 (2006.01); F21V 17/02 (2006.01); F21V 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/033 (2013.01); F21V 1/00 (2013.01); F21V 17/02 (2013.01); F21V 19/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 29920775 U1 20000302; EP 1103756 A2 20010530; EP 1103756 A3 20040218

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-12-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-11-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21S 8/06 A

2004-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21V 17/02 B

2004-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21V 14/04 B

2004-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21V 14/02 B

2004-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21V 7/00 B

2004-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21V 13/10 B

2004-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21V 3/02 B

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI