Global Patent Index - EP 1103762 A1

EP 1103762 A1 2001-05-30 - Grate bar for mobile grate

Title (en)

Grate bar for mobile grate

Title (de)

Rostplatte für feste und bewegliche Roste

Title (fr)

Barreau de grille pour grille mobile

Publication

EP 1103762 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00125905 A

Priority

DE 19957987 A

Abstract (en)

The grid plate has slit apertures (3, 4), uniformly distributed over the plate (1), in the form of a group of long front slit apertures (3) and short rear slit apertures (4). The aperture lengths of the two groups are suitable for the plate, and their sum is more than 65% of the measurement of the grid plate along the longitudinal axis of the slit apertures.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Rostplatte für feste und bewegliche Roste, insbesondere für Wanderroste an Lepolöfen, mit im wesentlichen parallel zueinander angeordneten Schlitzöffnungen für das Hindurchleiten von heißen Gasen. Um die Standzeiten einer solchen Rostplatte bei hoher thermischer und korrosiver Belastung zu verbessern, wird vorgeschlagen, daß die Schlitzöffnungen (3, 4) im wesentlichen gleichmäßig über die Rostplatte (1) verteilt sind und eine Gruppe vorderer, längerer Schlitzöffnungen (3) mit einer Öffnungslänge L1 und eine Gruppe hinterer, kürzerer Schlitzöffnungen (4) mit einer Öffnungslänge L2 umfassen, wobei die Öffnungslängen L1 und L2 jeweils auf die Oberseite der Rostplatte (1) bezogen sind und die Summe aus L1 und L2 größer als 65 % der Abmessung L3 der Rostplatte (1) entlang den Längsachsen der Schlitzöffnungen (3, 4) ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23H 17/12; F23H 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23H 1/02 (2006.01); F23H 17/12 (2006.01); F27D 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23H 17/12 (2013.01); F23H 1/02 (2013.01); F27D 15/022 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2345734 A1 19750320 - PETERS AG CLAUDIUS

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103762 A1 20010530; EP 1103762 B1 20040609; DE 19957987 A1 20010531

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-12-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-05-31 [PGRI BE] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Effective date: 20170112

2017-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-11-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-01-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006740 P 20040715

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR LU NL

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHEINKALK GMBH

2002-03-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR LU NL

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE LI

2002-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011129

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR LU NL

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI