Global Patent Index - EP 1103763 A1

EP 1103763 A1 2001-05-30 - Chimney

Title (en)

Chimney

Title (de)

Schornstein

Title (fr)

Cheminée

Publication

EP 1103763 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00850196 A

Priority

SE 9904246 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention is for a chimney having a flexible steel tube flue and a surrounding jacket and insulating material between the flue and the jacket. The jacket comprises an outer jacket (3) and an inner jacket (2) where the outer jacket (3) is continuous along the whole length of the chimney and the inner jacket (2) is split into sections between which there are open slots. The insulating material (5) is in the shape of powder or granules and flowing. A container for insulating material is arranged at the upper section of the chimney. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23J 11/00; F23J 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23J 11/00 (2006.01); F23J 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23J 13/025 (2013.01); F23J 11/00 (2013.01); F23J 2213/301 (2013.01); F23J 2213/303 (2013.01); F23J 2213/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103763 A1 20010530; EP 1103763 B1 20040616; AT 269514 T 20040715; DE 60011552 D1 20040722; DE 60011552 T2 20050825; NO 20005853 A 20010525; NO 20005853 D0 20001120; NO 316654 B1 20040322; SE 522196 C2 20040120; SE 9904246 D0 19991124; SE 9904246 L 20010525

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171017

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171018

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171116

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-06 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041116

2005-08-24 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-03-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-11-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040927

2004-09-16 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040916

2004-09-16 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040916

2004-09-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040916

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60011552 P 20040722

2004-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-06-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-16 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-06-16 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-06-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-06-16 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-06-16 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORDISKA SKORSTENSPRODUKTER AB

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011022

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI