Global Patent Index - EP 1103766 A2

EP 1103766 A2 2001-05-30 - Method and device for flame monitoring with gas burners

Title (en)

Method and device for flame monitoring with gas burners

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Flammenüberwachung bei Gasbrennern sowie entsprechende Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de surveillance de flamme avec des brûleurs à gaz

Publication

EP 1103766 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00124793 A

Priority

DE 19956395 A

Abstract (en)

The flame monitoring method has the output signal (21) provided by a flame monitoring device (20), for indicating the presence or absence of a flame, verified via an output signal (24) provided by a further sensor (23), e.g. a temperature sensor associated with a heat exchanger (18) inserted in the vicinity of the burner ignition flame. An Independent claim for a gas burner flame monitoring device is also included.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren sowie eine Vorrichtung zur Flammenüberwachung bei Gasbrennern. Nach dem Stand der Technik wird eine Flammenüberwachungseinrichtung verwendet, um auf das Vorhandensein oder Nichtvorhandensein einer Flamme zu schließen. In dem Fall, in dem jedoch die Flammenüberwachungseinrichtung irrtümlich das Vorhandensein einer Flamme anzeigt, kann Gas zum Gasbrenner gelangen, das dort nicht verbrennen würde und somit die Sicherheit der gesamten Anlage gefährden würde. Erfindungsgemäß wird durch Verwenden eines weiteren Sensors das Ausgangssignal der Flammenüberwachungseinrichtung fortlaufend verifiziert. Hierdurch kann mit größerer Sicherheit auf das Vorhandensein oder Nichtvorhandensein einer Flamme geschlossen werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 5/24; F23N 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/10 (2006.01); F23N 5/24 (2006.01); F23N 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/102 (2013.01); F23N 5/242 (2013.01); F23N 5/02 (2013.01); F23N 2025/19 (2013.01); F23N 2027/22 (2013.01); F23N 2029/14 (2013.01); F23N 2029/16 (2013.01); F23N 2031/10 (2013.01); F23N 2035/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103766 A2 20010530; EP 1103766 A3 20030820; DE 19956395 A1 20010613

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040221

2004-06-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI