Global Patent Index - EP 1103768 A2

EP 1103768 A2 2001-05-30 - Ventilation system

Title (en)

Ventilation system

Title (de)

Lüftungssystem

Title (fr)

Système de ventilation

Publication

EP 1103768 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00125564 A

Priority

DE 29920574 U

Abstract (en)

A modular unit for fitting to a ventilation system has a compact housing (10) into which are fitted the fan, filter, heat exchanger, sound damping and other parts of the system. The module is prepared in the workshop and is fitted as one unit. The separate components inside the module are pre-selected and can be replaced as required. The components can be fitted into the housing on slides.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein zum Einbau in lüftungstechnische Rohrleitungssysteme bestimmtes Lüftungssystem mit mehreren Komponenten, wie einem Ventilator (20), einer Filtereinheit (21), einer Schalldämpfereinheit (22) und einer Heizeinrichtung (23). Das Lüftungssystem ist gekennzeichnet durch eine Ausbildung als Kompaktbox (10) mit einem Gehäuse (11), in dem die Systemkomponenten (20, 21, 22, 23) aufgenommen sind und das mit Anschlußarmaturen (18, 19) für den Einbau in Rohrleitungssysteme ausgerüstet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 3/044; F24F 13/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/00 (2011.01); F24F 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/0007 (2013.01); F24F 13/02 (2013.01); F24F 13/0272 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 29920574 U1 20000413; EP 1103768 A2 20010530; EP 1103768 A3 20030910

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050216

2004-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040805

2004-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040309

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 24F 3/044 A

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 24F 13/20 B

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 24F 7/007 B

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI