Global Patent Index - EP 1103771 A2

EP 1103771 A2 2001-05-30 - Refrigerator door

Title (en)

Refrigerator door

Title (de)

Kältegerätetür

Title (fr)

Porte d'appareil frigorifique

Publication

EP 1103771 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01103983 A

Priority

  • DE 19751310 A
  • EP 98932066 A

Abstract (en)

A refrigerator and freezer combination (10) has refrigeration space which can be sealed by a heat insulating door (12,13) fitted with a door handle (30) attached in parallel to its horizontal edge. The door handle has one of its fixing positions on the vertical middle axis of the door on the front side (19). Its other fixing position is located on one of the vertical side surfaces of the door.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Kältegerätetür, wie Kühl- oder Gefriergerätetür, mit einem an deren Türkorpus festgesetzten Türgriff an der ein an wenigstens zwei Befestigungselementen festgesetzter Türgriff vorgesehen ist, ist der Türgriff waagerecht an der Frontseite der Tür angeordnet, wobei an der Tür frontseitig mittig zu ihrer Breite eine Befestigungsposition mit einem Befestigungselement vorgesehen ist, das zur Halterung des Türgriffs dient. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 23/02; E05B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 1/00 (2006.01); E05B 3/00 (2006.01); F25D 23/02 (2006.01); E05B 63/04 (2006.01); E05B 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/028 (2013.01); E05B 1/0015 (2013.01); E05B 3/00 (2013.01); E05B 63/04 (2013.01); E05B 65/0042 (2013.01); F25D 2323/022 (2013.01); F25D 2500/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB GR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19751310 A1 19990520; BR 9814665 A 20001003; CN 1145771 C 20040414; CN 1147693 C 20040428; CN 1279758 A 20010110; CN 1322932 A 20011121; EP 1032795 A1 20000906; EP 1032795 B1 20030806; EP 1103771 A2 20010530; EP 1103771 A3 20011114; EP 1103771 B1 20140416; ES 2205514 T3 20040501; ES 2460726 T3 20140514; TR 200001420 T2 20000921; TR 200100910 T2 20010723; WO 9926031 A1 19990527

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-12 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20170123

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160520

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-03-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160520

2017-01-23 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59814547

2017-01-23 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 59814547

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-02 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20150527

2015-05-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59814547

- Effective date: 20150402

2015-04-02 [REG DE R026] OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT

- Document: DE 59814547

- Effective date: 20150116

2015-03-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2015-02-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ARCELIK ANONIM SIRKETI

- Effective date: 20150116

2015-01-16 [REG DE R026] OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT

- Document: DE 59814547

2014-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140717

2014-05-28 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 59814547

- Effective date: 20140528

2014-05-14 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2460726 T3

- Effective date: 20140514

2014-04-16 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1032795 P

2014-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT

2014-04-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: SI

2014-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2014-03-05 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140204

2006-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2002-07-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB GR IT

2002-07-31 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20020514

2002-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020514

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT

2001-11-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI

2001-05-30 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1032795

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI