Global Patent Index - EP 1103774 A1

EP 1103774 A1 2001-05-30 - Plate heat exchanger in pressurized housing

Title (en)

Plate heat exchanger in pressurized housing

Title (de)

Plattenwärmetauscher in einem unter Druck stehendem Gehäuse

Title (fr)

Echangeur thermique à plaques muni d'une enveloppe de pressurisation

Publication

EP 1103774 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00403266 A

Priority

FR 9914796 A

Abstract (en)

The pressurised plate heat exchanger (2) has heat exchange plates surrounded by a pressurised casing (3). An insulating material (32) is placed between the casing (3) and the heat exchanger (2). The insulant can be perlite (rtm) which at least partially fills the space inside the casing. Alternatively, the insulation can be of strip or foil.

Abstract (fr)

Le corps d'échangeur (2) à plaques est entouré par une enveloppe de pressurisation (3). Un matériau thermiquement isolant (32) est disposé entre le corps d'échangeur (2) et l'enveloppe de pressurisation (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 1/03; F28D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 9/00 (2006.01); F28F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/00 (2013.01); F28D 9/0006 (2013.01); F28D 9/0068 (2013.01); F28F 2250/108 (2013.01); F28F 2270/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103774 A1 20010530; FR 2801376 A1 20010525; FR 2801376 B1 20020201

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040120

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI