Global Patent Index - EP 1103776 A2

EP 1103776 A2 2001-05-30 - Corrosion-protected construction in a pipe heat exchanger and a method for forming the construction

Title (en)

Corrosion-protected construction in a pipe heat exchanger and a method for forming the construction

Title (de)

Gegen Korrosion geschützter Rohrwärmetauscher und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur à tubes protégé contre la corrosion et sa méthode de construction

Publication

EP 1103776 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00660212 A

Priority

FI 992502 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a corrosion-protected construction in a pipe heat exchanger, which construction includes a pipe (11) protected from corrosion by a surfacing (15) and a pipe plate (13) forming the frame of the heat exchanger and supporting the end of the pipe (11). In addition, a through-hole (14) is formed in the pipe plate (13) for the pipe (11). The construction also includes an attachment piece (16), made of corrosion-resistant material, arranged between the pipe (11) and the through-hole (14). The attachment piece (16) is of a hardening corrosion-protection substance, which essentially fills the entire space (17) between the pipe (11) and the through-hole (14). The invention also relates to a method for forming the corrosion-protected construction in a pipe heat exchanger. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 19/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103776 A2 20010530; EP 1103776 A3 20030827

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-06-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI