Global Patent Index - EP 1103779 A1

EP 1103779 A1 2001-05-30 - Method for correcting a target related ballistic trajectory

Title (en)

Method for correcting a target related ballistic trajectory

Title (de)

Verfahren zur zielbezogenen Korrektur einer ballistischen Flugbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé de correction d'une trajectoire ballistique liée à une cible

Publication

EP 1103779 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00124171 A

Priority

DE 19957363 A

Abstract (en)

The error correction method uses on board GPS satellite (27) trajectory measurement (24) to select aerodynamic braking (26) with parametric disturbance correction (19) to steepen the projectile (17) path towards the minimum range error bound (23) path (21) which has been aimed at the target (13).

Abstract (de)

Um ohne den technologischen Aufwand für eine selbsttätige Zielsuchsteuerung die unvermeidliche Bahnstreuung ballistisch verbrachter Projektile im Zielgebiet spürbar zu verringern und damit die Treffergenauigkeit wesentlich zu erhöhen, wird die minimale Flugbahn unter Berücksichtigung des Fehlerhaushalts der Waffe und der zu erwartenden externen Störeinflüsse auf eine reale Flugbahn durch die vorher aufgeklärte Zielposition verlegt, so daß alle realen Flugbahnen bis zur maximalen Flugbahn dieses Gesamtfehlerhaushalts hinter der Zielposition liegen. Dann wird der Abstieg des Projektils ins Zielgebiet aus der realen Flugbahn heraus zur minimalen, also zur Zielposition hin verkürzt. Dafür wird auf der realen Flugbahn das Erreichen des von der theoretischen Restflugzeit abhängigen optimalen Initialisierungspunktes für eine aerodynamische Bremseinrichtung am Projektil zu bestimmt, indem die reale Flugbahn im Wege der Satellitennavigation laufend vermessen und die Annäherung an den Schnittpunkt mit der Auslösekurve, also der Folge optimaler Initialisierungspunkte für den Fächer realer Flugbahnen, störabhängig festgestellt wird, aus welchem heraus sich eine Übergangsflugbahn an die minimale Flugbahn durch die Zielposition hindurch anschmiegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41G 7/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41G 7/34 (2006.01); G01S 19/53 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41G 7/346 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103779 A1 20010530; EP 1103779 B1 20040204; AT 259053 T 20040215; DE 19957363 A1 20010531; SG 93904 A1 20030121; US 6467721 B1 20021022

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-12-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DIEHL DEFENCE GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: JUNGHANS MICROTEC GMBH, 78655 DUNNINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 50005186

2017-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040704

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DIEHL MUNITIONSSYSTEME G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DIEHL MUNITIONSSYSTEME G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-01-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041108

2004-11-08 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041108

2004-09-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-08-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-06-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040513

2004-05-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-05-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005186 P 20040311

2004-03-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-04 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-04 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI