Global Patent Index - EP 1103809 A1

EP 1103809 A1 2001-05-30 - Gas sensor

Title (en)

Gas sensor

Title (de)

Gassensor

Title (fr)

Capteur de gaz

Publication

EP 1103809 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00124912 A

Priority

DE 19956744 A

Abstract (en)

Gas sensor comprises a field effect transistor with source, drain and channel regions in a semiconductor element, and a gate electrode on a substrate (1) into which a gas-sensitive layer (2) is integrated. The element with an insulating layer (6) is located directly on the gas-sensitive layer. A gas channel (10) is formed by means of an opening in the insulating layer. The distance between the channel region and the gas-sensitive layer is given by the layer thickness of the insulating layer.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Gassensor zur Detektion von Gasen nach dem Prinzip der Austrittsarbeitsmessung vorgestellt. Der eingesetzte Feldeffekttransistor wird in Flip-Chip-Technologie auf einem Keramiksubstrat (1) montiert, wobei das Halbleiterbauelement (5) direkt auf der gassensitiven Schicht (2) aufsitzt. Als Abstandhalter dient eine im Bereich des Kanals des Feldeffekttransistors mit einer Öffnung versehene Passivierungsschicht (6) mit definierter Stärke. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 27/414

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/414 (2006.01); G01N 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/4143 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103809 A1 20010530; DE 19956744 A1 20010607; DE 19956744 C2 20020221

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-10 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20091105

2007-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050617

2005-08-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MICRONAS GMBH

2005-08-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050617

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI