Global Patent Index - EP 1103847 B1

EP 1103847 B1 2002-09-11 - Silver halide photographic film material exhibiting increased covering power and "colder" blue-black image tone

Title (en)

Silver halide photographic film material exhibiting increased covering power and "colder" blue-black image tone

Title (de)

Photographisches Silberhalogenid-Filmmaterial mit erhöhter Deckkraft und einem "kälteren" blauschwarzen Bildton

Title (fr)

Pellicule photographique à l'halogénure d'argent ayant un pouvoir opacifiant accru et un ton de l'image noir bleuâtre "plus froid"

Publication

EP 1103847 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 00203916 A

Priority

  • EP 00203916 A
  • EP 99204010 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1103847A1] A black-and-white silver halide photographic film material, particularly suitable for use in radiography, has been disclosed, said material comprising a transparent film support having first and second major surfaces coated with a subbing layer, further coated adjacent thereto on one side (for a single-side coated material) or on both sides (for a duplitized material) of said film support and overcoated with a protective antistress layer, a light-sensitive silver halide emulsion layer having chemically and spectrally sensitized ä111ü tabular hexagonal grains, accounting for at least 50 % of the total projective surface of all grains, wherein said film material is coated with a low amount of silver and wherein said protective antistress layer(s) and/or another hydrophilic non-light-sensitive layer comprise(s) a compound according to general formula (I) in an amount of at least 0.5 mmole per mole of coated silver halide, as claimed. A radiographic screen/film combination has also been disclosed, said combination comprising a duplitized film as described herein sandwiched between a pair of supported or self-supporting X-ray intensifying screens emitting radiation in the wavelength range for which said material has been made spectrally sensitive in order to obtain a black-and-white image after exposure of said screen/film combination, followed by processing of the film material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/76; G03C 1/005; G03C 5/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/005 (2006.01); G03C 1/76 (2006.01); G03C 5/17 (2006.01); G03C 1/12 (2006.01); G03C 1/29 (2006.01); G03C 1/34 (2006.01); G03C 1/37 (2006.01); G03C 1/91 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/0051 (2013.01); G03C 1/7614 (2013.01); G03C 5/17 (2013.01); G03C 1/005 (2013.01); G03C 1/122 (2013.01); G03C 1/29 (2013.01); G03C 1/346 (2013.01); G03C 1/37 (2013.01); G03C 1/91 (2013.01); G03C 2001/0055 (2013.01); G03C 2001/7635 (2013.01); G03C 2007/3025 (2013.01); G03C 2200/03 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103847 A1 20010530; EP 1103847 B1 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081107

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081107

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071018

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-04-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-03-07 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20070213

2005-09-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2003-10-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031027

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-10-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031024

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-01-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000431 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020308

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI