Global Patent Index - EP 1103848 A1

EP 1103848 A1 2001-05-30 - Light-sensitive silver halide photographic film material and radiographic intensifying screen-film combination

Title (en)

Light-sensitive silver halide photographic film material and radiographic intensifying screen-film combination

Title (de)

Lichtempfindliches photographisches Silberhalogenidfilmmaterial und eine Kombination eines radiographischen Verstärkungsschirms mit diesem Film

Title (fr)

Film photographique à l'halogénure d'argent sensible à la lumière et une structure radiographique combinant le film et un écran intensificateur

Publication

EP 1103848 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00203917 A

Priority

  • EP 00203917 A
  • EP 99204009 A

Abstract (en)

A light-sensitive silver halide photographic film material has been provided, said film material comprising a transparent support and on both sides thereof at least one light-sensitive emulsion layer having spectrally and chemically sensitized tabular silver halide grains rich in silver bromide, further having silver iodide in an amount of less than 3 mole % based on silver, with two flat parallel ä111ü crystal faces, said grains accounting for a total projective surface of said parallel crystal faces in said emulsion of at least 50 %, further having an average aspect ratio of at least 2:1, a grain thickness of from 0.05 up to 0.15 mu m, a site-directing azacyanine compound satisfying the general formulae disclosed herein in an amount of not less than 1 x 10<-4> mole per mole of silver halide coated and one or more J-aggregating spectrally sensitizing dye(s), wherein a molar ratio amount between said site directing compound and said J-aggregating spectrally sensitizing dye(s) is at least 1:6 for a grain coverage of said ä111ü tabular grains exceeding 50 %. A radiographic screen/film combination has also been described comprising said light-sensitive silver halide photographic film material and two supporting or self-supporting X-ray intensifying screens)comprising luminescent phosphors, wherein by contacting the film material with a sandwich of a pair of said intensifying screens and exposing said combination to X-rays, emission of radiation by said luminescent phosphors in the wavelength range for which said material has been made spectrally sensitive provides a black-and-white diagnostic image after processing of said exposed radiographic film material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 5/16; G03C 1/12; G03C 5/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/07 (2006.01); G03C 1/12 (2006.01); G03C 5/16 (2006.01); G03C 1/005 (2006.01); G03C 1/18 (2006.01); G03C 5/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/122 (2013.01); G03C 1/07 (2013.01); G03C 5/16 (2013.01); G03C 1/0051 (2013.01); G03C 1/18 (2013.01); G03C 5/17 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. G03C 1/0051 + G03C 2200/03 + G03C 2001/03511 + G03C 2001/0055
  2. G03C 5/16 + G03C 2007/3025 + G03C 2005/168

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103848 A1 20010530; EP 1103848 B1 20070117

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111107

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111107

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070117

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070907

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070418

2007-12-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071018

2007-04-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60033002 P 20070308

2007-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-01-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI