Global Patent Index - EP 1103850 A1

EP 1103850 A1 2001-05-30 - Radiographic film material exhibiting increased covering power and "colder" blue-black image tone

Title (en)

Radiographic film material exhibiting increased covering power and "colder" blue-black image tone

Title (de)

Radiographisches Filmmaterial mit verbesserter Deckkraft und blauschwarzem Bildton

Title (fr)

Film radiographique avec pouvoir opacifiant amélioré et un ton de l'image noir-bleu

Publication

EP 1103850 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00203914 A

Priority

  • EP 00203914 A
  • EP 99204006 A
  • EP 99204008 A

Abstract (en)

A radiographic film material has been provided, comprising a transparent film support having first and second major surfaces coated, apart from a subbing layer and, optionally, a non-light-sensitive hydrophilic layer thereupon, with at least one light-sensitive silver halide emulsion layer overcoated with a protective antistress layer, said emulsion layer(s) having chemically and spectrally sensitized ä111ü tabular hexagonal core-shell emulsion grains or crystals in an amount of at least 50 % of the total projective grain surface of all grains, said grains being composed of a silver bromide core and a silver bromoiodide shell having an average amount over the whole crystal volume of more than 90 mole % of silver bromide, said grains further having a mean equivalent volume diameter of from 0.3 mu m up to 1.0 mu m and an average grain thickness of less than 0.30 mu m, wherein said film material is coated with a total amount of silver, expressed as an equivalent amount of silver nitrate of less than 7 g/m2, characterized in that all silver iodide is present in an outermost shell corresponding with at most 20 % of all silver halide precipitated in order to provide silver iodide to be present in the whole grain volume of said tabular grains in an average amount of less than 1 mole % of iodide, based on silver and in that said protective antistress layer, said non-light-sensitive hydrophilic layer or both said protective antistress layer and said non-light-sensitive hydrophilic layer comprise a mercapto-tetrazole compound as in general formula (I),presented in the claims and in the detailed description, said compound being present in high amounts of at least 0.5 mmole per mole of silver halide coated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 5/17; G03C 1/35

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/005 (2006.01); G03C 1/35 (2006.01); G03C 5/17 (2006.01); G21K 4/00 (2006.01); G03C 1/12 (2006.01); G03C 1/76 (2006.01); G03C 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21K 4/00 (2013.01); G03C 1/005 (2013.01); G03C 1/0051 (2013.01); G03C 1/355 (2013.01); G03C 5/17 (2013.01); G03C 1/12 (2013.01); G03C 1/122 (2013.01); G03C 1/35 (2013.01); G03C 1/7614 (2013.01); G03C 5/16 (2013.01); G21K 2004/06 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. G03C 1/0051 + G03C 2200/03 + G03C 2001/03511 + G03C 2001/03535
  2. G03C 1/0051 + G03C 2001/03535 + G03C 2001/03558
  3. G03C 1/7614 + G03C 2001/7635 + G03C 2200/40
  4. G03C 5/16 + G03C 2007/3025 + G03C 2005/168

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103850 A1 20010530; EP 1103850 B1 20060719

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111107

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111107

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070511

2007-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070420

2007-05-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-04-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-03-07 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20070213

2006-10-20 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061020

2006-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60029407 P 20060831

2006-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-07-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI