Global Patent Index - EP 1103853 A1

EP 1103853 A1 2001-05-30 - Colour photographic developer concentrate

Title (en)

Colour photographic developer concentrate

Title (de)

Photographisches Farbentwicklerkonzentrat

Title (fr)

Révélateur pour la photographie en couleur sous forme concentrée

Publication

EP 1103853 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00203480 A

Priority

DE 19956629 A

Abstract (en)

A one-part, optionally multi-phase, colour developer concentrate which contains at least one colour developer substance, at least one auxiliary solvent, an antioxidant, a buffer system and alkali, wherein the antioxidant is a mixture of 0.1 to 100 mmol of hydroxylamine and 0.01 to 4 mol of one or more substituted hydroxylamines, does not darken on storage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 7/413; G03C 5/26; G03C 7/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/407 (2006.01); G03C 7/413 (2006.01); G03C 5/26 (2006.01); G03C 7/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/413 (2013.01); G03C 5/266 (2013.01); G03C 7/44 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103853 A1 20010530; EP 1103853 B1 20021030; DE 19956629 A1 20010613; JP 2001154322 A 20010608

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071005

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071005

2008-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071005

2008-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *A&O IMAGING SOLUTIONS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20071031

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *A&O IMAGING SOLUTIONS G.M.B.H.ROONSTRASSE 9-11, D

- Effective date: 20050201

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *A&O IMAGING SOLUTIONS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050201

2006-11-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20061123

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-10-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061023

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-10-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061023

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2004-10-20 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20040923

2003-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-08-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030827

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000675 20021205

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2002-10-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020408

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI