Global Patent Index - EP 1103874 A3

EP 1103874 A3 2003-06-04 - Method for optimizing the speeds of a combined installation

Title (en)

Method for optimizing the speeds of a combined installation

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Optimierung der Geschwindigkeiten einer Verbundanlage

Title (fr)

Procédé pour optimiser les vitesses d'une installation combinée

Publication

EP 1103874 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00125767 A

Priority

AT 200199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1103874A2] Process for optimizing the seed of a conveyor device comprises posing a mathematical problem for the whole device with the conveyor speeds in at least one plant part as variables, the technological boundaries and the plant boundaries for each plant part. The problem is solved through a process of dimensional mathematical optimization theories and the results are used for controlling the plant or in the framework of the production planning.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05B 13/02; B21B 37/00; B21B 41/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/00 (2006.01); B21B 41/12 (2006.01); G05B 13/02 (2006.01); B21B 1/28 (2006.01); B21B 45/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05B 13/021 (2013.01); B21B 37/00 (2013.01); B21B 41/12 (2013.01); B21B 1/28 (2013.01); B21B 45/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5375448 A 19941227 - KATAYAMA YASUNORI [JP], et al
  • [A] US 4292825 A 19811006 - MOROOKA YASUO, et al
  • [A] US 5040395 A 19910820 - SEKI YOSHIRO [JP], et al
  • [A] US 5386945 A 19950207 - NOSE KAZUO [JP], et al
  • [A] NOGUCHI Y ET AL: "MULTIVARIABLE CONTROOL OF INTERSTAND TENSION AND EXIT HEIGHT OF THEMATERIAL FOR BAR AND WIRE ROD ROLLING", ROBOTICS, VISION AND SENSORS, SIGNAL PROCESSING AND CONTROL. MAUI, NOE. 15 - 19, 1993, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS,CONTROL, AND INSTRUMENTATION (IECON), NEW YORK, IEEE, US, vol. 3, 15 November 1993 (1993-11-15), pages 2299 - 2304, XP000437592

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103874 A2 20010530; EP 1103874 A3 20030604; AT 411435 B 20040126; AT A200199 A 20030615

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170503

2015-06-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PRIMETALS TECHNOLOGIES AUSTRIA GMBH

2010-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS VAI METALS TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

2008-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS VAI METALS TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050314

2005-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050314

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030526

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI