Global Patent Index - EP 1103923 A2

EP 1103923 A2 2001-05-30 - Method for the automatic ordering of articles of consumption and apparatus for carrying out the method

Title (en)

Method for the automatic ordering of articles of consumption and apparatus for carrying out the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum automatischen Bestellen von Verbrauchsmaterial und Anordnung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé pour commander automatiquement des articles de consommation et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé

Publication

EP 1103923 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250399 A

Priority

DE 19958949 A

Abstract (en)

The automatic ordering method monitors the usage of the material within a machine, e.g. the usage of the thermal transfer ink ribbon within a franking machine (1), for transmission of an ordering request incorporating an identification code to a remote data centre (100), via an established communication link, when the material usage reaches a threshold level. The machine is identified at the data centre from the identification code and the material order is placed. An Independent claim for an automatic replacement material ordering device is also included.

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren zum automatischen Bestellen von Verbrauchsmaterial für ein Gerät und eine Anordnung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens. Das Verfahren umfaßt die Schritte: Überwachen und Auswerten einer vorbestimmten Verbrauchsgröße hinsichtlich des Erreichens eines Schwellwertes der Verbrauchsgröße vor dem Verbrauchsende des Verbrauchsmaterials, Herstellen einer Kommunikationsverbindung zwischen der Frankiermaschine und einem entfernten Datenzentrum und automatische Erzeugung und Übermittellung einer Bestellungsnachricht, wobei letztere einen Identifizierungscode einschließt, Identifizieren des Bestellers anhand des Identifizierungscodes, Ermitteln und Auslösen der Bestellung des zum Gerät gehörigen Verbrauchsmaterials. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/0008 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00169 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0025 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00322 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00532 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103923 A2 20010530; EP 1103923 A3 20010816; EP 1103923 B1 20150923; DE 19958949 A1 20010607; US 7254563 B1 20070807

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171013

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20160624

2016-06-24 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50016422

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-29 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50016422

2015-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2015-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2015-09-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2015-07-22 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150623

2015-02-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2006-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060821

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

2002-05-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020118

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07B 17/00 A, 7G 03G 15/00 B

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI