Global Patent Index - EP 1103924 A2

EP 1103924 A2 2001-05-30 - Method for protecting a device against operating with unauthorised articles of consumption and apparatus for carrying out the method

Title (en)

Method for protecting a device against operating with unauthorised articles of consumption and apparatus for carrying out the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Schutz eines Gerätes vor einem Betreiben mit unzulässigem Verbrauchsmaterial und Anordnung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de protection d'un dispositif contre son fonctionnement avec des articles de consommation non autorisés et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé

Publication

EP 1103924 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250400 A

Priority

DE 19958941 A

Abstract (en)

The protection method has the authenticity of the material used in a franking machine (1) checked at a remote data centre (100), by comparison of a transmitted codeword identifying the material entered in the franking machine with a stored reference codeword, before transmission of an authorisation from the remote data centre to the franking machine. An Independent claim for a device for blocking use of a franking machine with unauthorised material is also included.

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren zum Schutz eines Gerätes vor einem Betreiben mit unzulässigem Verbrauchsmaterial, dessen Authentizität in einem entfernten Datenzentrum überprüft wird, umfaßt die Schritte: Generieren von mindestens einem Codewort, Speicherung einer Zuordnung zu einem bestimmten Verbrauchsmaterial in Form eines Datensatzes mit Referenzcodewort, Aggregation des Verbrauchsmaterials mit dem generierten Codewort, welches in vorbestimmter Beziehung zum Referenzcodewort oder zu einer Gruppe von Referenzcodewörtern steht, welche im Datenzentrum gespeichert vorliegen, Erkennen einer Operation des Wechselns eines Verbrauchsmaterials im Gerät, Herstellen einer Kommunikationsverbindung zum entfernten Datenzentrum und Übermittellung des mit dem Verbrauchsmaterial aggregierten Codewortes, Empfangen des übermittelten Codewortes im Datenzentrum und Überprüfung der Authentizität des Verbrauchsmaterials anhand der gespeicherten Referenzcodewörter sowie, Empfangen einer Benachrichtigung für das Gerät nach Überprüfung des Codes im Datenzentrum. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01); G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17546 (2013.01); G07B 17/0008 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00169 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0025 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00322 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00532 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103924 A2 20010530; EP 1103924 A3 20010816; EP 1103924 B1 20070627; DE 19958941 A1 20010607; DE 19958941 B4 20061109; DE 50014441 D1 20070809; US 6978255 B1 20051220

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151016

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH, 16547 BIRKENWERDER, DE

- Document: DE 50014441

- Effective date: 20150330

2013-05-08 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50014441

- Effective date: 20130314

2013-04-10 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20130319

2008-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080328

2007-12-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-09-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070829

2007-08-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014441 P 20070809

2007-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2007-06-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

2002-05-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020118

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07B 17/00 A, 7B 41J 2/175 B

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI