Global Patent Index - EP 1103930 A2

EP 1103930 A2 2001-05-30 - Adaptable hand operated device for selecting coins

Title (en)

Adaptable hand operated device for selecting coins

Title (de)

Anpassbare handbetätigte Münzprüfvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Sélecteur adaptable de pièces de monnaie actionné à la main

Publication

EP 1103930 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00500251 A

Priority

  • EP 00500251 A
  • EP 99500226 A

Abstract (en)

Adaptable hand operated device for selecting coins, with a frame (10) formed by several parallel walls (12) defining several slots (13, 14) for coins passing, a rotating element (20), a crank (25) mounted on said frame (10) limited to a single direction by a first ratchet (30), a plurality of disks (40) secured to the element (20), each arranged between two walls (12) and provided with a slot (42) for a kind of coin, and a plurality of levers (50) each elastically loaded supported on a peripheral edge (44) of a respective disk (40), constituting with a slot (42) a second ratchet comprising obturating parts (70) provided with means for being secured between two walls (12) obturating the related inlet slot (13) and an appendage for locking the respective lever (50) to a position which disables its effect of ratchet, locking its elastic load and allowing the rotation of the element (20) and a plurality of elastic elements (80), acting independently on a related lever (50) pushing it against the peripheral edge (44) of the respective disk (40). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 5/02; G07F 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 5/02 (2006.01); G07F 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 5/02 (2013.01); G07F 5/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

ES 1004783 A

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103930 A2 20010530; EP 1103930 A3 20040506

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-22 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060113

2005-08-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050624

2005-03-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-03-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): ES

2005-03-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-01-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07D 5/02 A

2004-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07F 5/02 B

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI