Global Patent Index - EP 1103931 A1

EP 1103931 A1 2001-05-30 - Apparatus for banknote recognition

Title (en)

Apparatus for banknote recognition

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Banknoterkennung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de reconnaissance de billets de banque

Publication

EP 1103931 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99811099 A

Priority

EP 99811099 A

Abstract (en)

The banknote checking device has a sensor for detecting at least one characteristic marking of a banknote, coupled to an evaluation circuit for signalling the validity of the checked banknote, the device incorporated within an everyday item, e.g. a writing pen. The banknote checking device may be incorporated in a pocket clip (4.1) of a writing pen (1), with a capacitive sensor detecting a capacitance pattern of the checked banknote, the result of the banknote check indicated via a pair of integrated LED's (9.1,9.2).

Abstract (de)

In einen Gegenstand des täglichen Gebrauchs, beispielsweise einen Kugelschreiber (1), bestehend aus einem Gehäusemittelteil (2), einer Gehäusespitze (3) und einem Gehäuseende (4), wird eine Elektroden-Schaltung 5 zur Banknotenerkennung integriert. Dazu weist das Gehäusemittelteil (2) des Kugelschreibers (1) eine durch den Klemmbügel 4.1 verdeckte Ausnehmung (6) auf, in welche die Elektroden-Schaltung 5 hineinpasst. Die Elektroden-Schaltung (5) umfasst einen kapazitiven Sensor zur Registrierung des Kapazitätsmusters einer Banknote, welche zwischen dem Klemmbügel 4.1 und dem Gehäusemittelteil (2) hindurchgezogen wird. Mit einem ebenfalls in die Elektroden-Schaltung (5) integrierten Mikrochip wird ein Erkennungsresultat berechnet, welches dem Benutzer mit Hilfe zweier in das Gehäusemittelteil (2) integrierter LED's (9.1, 9.2) angezeigt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 7/00; G04B 47/00; G04G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 47/00 (2006.01); G04G 21/02 (2010.01); G07D 7/128 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/128 (2013.01); G04B 47/00 (2013.01); G04G 21/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4339417 A1 19950524 - OPTIMA BUEROTECHNIK GMBH [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103931 A1 20010530; AU 1378001 A 20010612; AU 1378101 A 20010612; WO 0141076 A1 20010607; WO 0141077 A1 20010607

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-31 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011201

2002-03-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-06-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI