Global Patent Index - EP 1103932 A1

EP 1103932 A1 2001-05-30 - Device for conveying objects, coins in particular

Title (en)

Device for conveying objects, coins in particular

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Fördern von vereinzelten Gegenständen, insbesondere Münzen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour convoyer des objets, en particulier des pièces de monnaie

Publication

EP 1103932 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00250391 A

Priority

DE 19957482 A

Abstract (en)

The coin feed device has a feed path (2) and a lamella feed belt (4) circulated around a transport arm at a given distance from the feed path, the lower run (5) of the lamella feed belt spaced from the transport path by a distance which is less than the minimum thickness of the transported coins (1), for frictional engagement of the transported coins by the lamella points (6) of the feed belt lower run. An Independent claim for application of a coin feed device for feeding coins in a horizontal, vertical and/or inclined direction is also included.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Fördern von vereinzelten Gegenständen (1), insbesondere von scheibenförmigen Gegenständen wie Münzen, mit einer Führungsbahn (2) und mit einem in Abstand (d) von der Führungsbahn (2) auf einem Transportarm (3) umlaufenden Förderriemen (4), wobei der Abstand (d) eines der Führungsbahn zugewandten Trums (5) des Transportriemens (4) zur Führungsbahn (2) kleiner als die geringste Höhe eines Gegenstandes (1) über der Führungsbahn (2) ist, wobei die Gegenstände (1) von dem der Führungsbahn (2) zugewandten Trum (5) des Förderriemens (4) ergreifbar und auf der Führungsbahn (2) förderbar sind und wobei die Haftreibungs- und/oder Gleitreibungskräfte zwischen den Gegenständen (1) und dem Förderriemen (4) größer sind als die Haftreibungs- und/oder Gleitreibungskräfte zwischen den Gegenständen (1) und der Führungsbahn (2). Sie ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß der Förderriemen (4) ein Lamellenriemen (5) ist, und daß das der Führungsbahn (2) zugewandte Trum (5) des Lamellenriemens (4) über die gesamte Längserstreckung des Transportarms (3) mit der Maßgabe geführt wird, daß zu der Führungsbahn (2) hinweisende Lamellenspitzen (6) einen Abstand d' von der Führungsbahn (2) aufweisen, welcher kleiner als die geringste Höhe eines Gegenstandes (1) über der Führungsbahn (2) ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 9/00 (2013.01); Y10S 209/917 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0616303 B1 19980128 - ZIMMERMANN GMBH & CO KG F [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103932 A1 20010530; DE 19957482 A1 20010607; DE 19957482 C2 20030515; US 6592446 B1 20030715

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCAN COIN INDUSTRIES AB

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020219

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-02-20 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20011123;LT PAYMENT 20011123;LV PAYMENT 20011123;MK PAYMENT 20011123;RO PAYMENT 20011123;SI PAYMENT 20011123

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011123

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI