Global Patent Index - EP 1103937 A1

EP 1103937 A1 2001-05-30 - Fire detector

Title (en)

Fire detector

Title (de)

Brandmelder

Title (fr)

Détecteur d'incendie

Publication

EP 1103937 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122975 A

Priority

EP 99122975 A

Abstract (en)

The fire alarm (1) comprises a light source (7), measuring chamber (9) and a light receiver (8), all housed within an optical module (5). A temperature sensor (13) and the light receiver (8) are both connected to an evaluation electronic module (6). A sensor (12) for combustion gas, e.g. CO, is additionally provided. The electronic module (6) comprises a fuzzy logic controller, which compares the output signals of individual sensors (5,12,13) and determines the type of fire. For each type of fire a different application specific algorithm is selected. The fuzzy logic associates smoke concentration with combustion gas concentration and with a parameter formed from the gradients of temperature and of smoke gas.

Abstract (de)

Der Brandmelder (1) enthält ein eine Lichtquelle (7), eine Messkammer (9) und einen Lichtempfänger (8) aufweisenden Optikmodul (5), einen Temperatursensor (13) und eine an den Lichtempfänger (8) und den Temperatursensor (13) angeschlossene Auswerteelektronic (6). Zusätzlich ist im Melder (1) ein Sensor (12) für ein Brandgas, vorzugsweise für CO, vorgesehen. Die Auswerteelektronik (6) weist einen Fuzzy-Regler auf, in welchem eine Verknüpfung der Signale der einzelnen Sensoren (5,12,13) und eine Diagnose der jeweiligen Brandart erfolgt. Für jede Brandart ist ein spezieller applikationsspezifischer Algorithmus bereitgestellt und anhand der Diagnose auswählbar. Im Fuzzy-Regler erfolgt eine Verknüpfung der Rauchkonzentration mit der Brandgaskonzentration und mit einem aus dem Gradienten der Temperatur und dem Gradienten des Rauchgases gebildeten Parameter. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 29/18; G08B 17/107

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 17/06 (2006.01); G08B 17/00 (2006.01); G08B 17/10 (2006.01); G08B 17/107 (2006.01); G08B 17/117 (2006.01); G08B 17/12 (2006.01); G08B 29/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 29/186 (2013.01); G08B 17/107 (2013.01); G08B 17/113 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103937 A1 20010530; EP 1103937 B1 20050511; AT 295595 T 20050515; AU 6546400 A 20010517; AU 777015 B2 20040930; CN 1297213 A 20010530; CZ 20004287 A3 20010711; CZ 301163 B6 20091125; DE 59912047 D1 20050616; ES 2243027 T3 20051116; HU 0004474 A2 20010628; HU 0004474 A3 20040830; HU 0004474 D0 20010129; HU 224676 B1 20051228; JP 2001175963 A 20010629; JP 4767404 B2 20110907; KR 20010051578 A 20010625; NO 20005717 A 20010521; NO 20005717 D0 20001113; PL 343954 A1 20010521; PT 1103937 E 20050930; US 6788197 B1 20040907

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171113

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171113

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170907 AND 20170913

2016-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160519

2016-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151119

2016-08-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20151120

2016-07-29 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20160624

2016-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 295595 T

- Effective date: 20151119

2016-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-05-25 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20160519

2016-04-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG, ZUERICH, CH

- Document: DE 59912047

2016-04-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912047

- Representative's name: MAIER, DANIEL, DIPL.-ING. UNIV., DE

2016-04-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160419

2016-03-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Effective date: 20160202

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-23 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Effective date: 20151009

2015-05-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Document: AT 295595 T

- Effective date: 20150330

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80333 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59912047

- Effective date: 20150407

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80333 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59912047

- Effective date: 20150407

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150209

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-03-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150220 AND 20150225

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141009

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20141029

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141103

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141226

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

2013-08-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SIEMENS A.G.

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-03-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20111229

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-04-13 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110318

2010-04-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: SIEMENS A.G.WITTELSBACHERPLATZ 2, DE-80333 MUENCHE

- Effective date: 20100423

2010-04-30 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: SIEMENS A.G.

- Effective date: 20100423

2009-06-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090514 AND 20090520

2009-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG, INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY

2009-01-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Free text: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG C-IPR#GUBELSTRASSE 22#6300 ZUG (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#WITTELSBACHERPLATZ 2#80333 MUENCHEN (DE)

2008-11-07 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-11-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-09-10 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Effective date: 20080829

2008-09-10 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20080829

2007-02-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG C-IPR

- Free text: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG#BELLERIVESTRASSE 36#8034 ZUERICH (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG C-IPR#GUBELSTRASSE 22#6300 ZUG (CH)

2006-05-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060214

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-11-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-19 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051119

2005-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2243027 T3

2005-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20050809

2005-08-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050728

2005-08-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-08-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-08-11 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-06-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912047 P 20050616

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-05-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-05-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050511

2005-01-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040225

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011120

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI