Global Patent Index - EP 1103943 A2

EP 1103943 A2 2001-05-30 - Information optical display device

Title (en)

Information optical display device

Title (de)

Wiedergabeeinrichtung zur optischen Wiedergabe von Informationen

Title (fr)

Dispositif optique d'affichage d'informations

Publication

EP 1103943 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115073 A

Priority

DE 19956458 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a base element with a light source and at least one pictogram reproducing the information and illuminated by the light source. The base element is a foil and the light source is a light pigment layer (S6) between electrodes (S5,S8) facing towards and way from the observer which gives off light when a voltage is applied to the electrodes. An opaque cover sheet (S1) has openings forming at least one pictogram (13). Independent claims are also included for the following: a switch with a reproduction device for optical reproduction of information.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung geht aus von einer Wiedergabeeinrichtung zur optischen Wiedergabe von Informationen an insbesondere einen menschlichen Betrachter, insbesondere zur Anzeige von Zuständen oder Schaltstellungen, mit einem Grundelement, mit einer an dem Grundelement angeordneten Lichtquelle und mit wenigstens einem die wiederzugebende Information wiedergebenden, von der Lichtquelle ausleuchtbaren Piktogramm. Die Erfindung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, dass das Grundelement eine Grundfolie ist, dass als Lichtquelle eine Leuchtpigmentschicht vorhanden ist, dass eine dem Betrachter zugewandte erste Elektrode und eine dem Betrachter abgewandte Rückelektrode vorhanden ist, wobei die Leuchtpigmentschicht zwischen den beiden Elektroden angeordnet ist, dass durch Anlegen einer Spannung an die Elektroden die Leuchtpigmentschicht wenigstens abschnittsweise zum Leuchten gebracht werden kann und dass auf der dem Betrachter zugewandten Seite der Leuchtpigmentschicht eine undurchsichtige Abdeckschicht vorhanden ist, welche durchsichtige Aussparungen in Form und Größe des wenigstens einen Piktogramms aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 13/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 13/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103943 A2 20010530; EP 1103943 A3 20010822; EP 1103943 B1 20081001; DE 19956458 A1 20010531; DE 50015378 D1 20081113

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130727

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-04-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50015378

- Effective date: 20140201

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120718

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120713

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120816

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090727

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090727

2009-09-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090702

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090112

2008-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015378 P 20081113

2008-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2008-10-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010922

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI