Global Patent Index - EP 1103944 A1

EP 1103944 A1 2001-05-30 - Fastening means

Title (en)

Fastening means

Title (de)

Befestigungsmittel

Title (fr)

Moyens de fixation

Publication

EP 1103944 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00250339 A

Priority

DE 29918473 U

Abstract (en)

During delivery a pre-fabricated automobile garage (2) is covered with a tarpaulin which is secured at the corners (10). The garage has especially external corner fixtures (12) which act as anchorage points for the tarpaulin straps during motion of the delivery vehicle.

Abstract (de)

Befestigungsmittel zum Befestigen eines Objektes, insbesondere einer Plane, an einem Gegenstand, insbesondere einer Fertiggarage (2), gekennzeichnet durch einen dem Gegenstand (2) zugeordneten Aufnahmeabschnitt, der eine Aufnahme für mindestens einen extremalen Bereich (10) des Gegenstandes (2) bildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 23/00; B65D 71/04; E04H 6/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 23/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29918473 U1 20010222; EP 1103944 A1 20010530; PL 195637 B1 20071031; PL 343301 A1 20010423

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030503

2005-04-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-03-09 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2005-03-09 [DBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (DELETED)

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI