Global Patent Index - EP 1103984 A1

EP 1103984 A1 2001-05-30 - Container for shipping and/or storing radioactive heat releasing parts

Title (en)

Container for shipping and/or storing radioactive heat releasing parts

Title (de)

Transport- und/oder Lagerbehälter für radioaktive wärmeentwickelnde Elemente

Title (fr)

Conteneur de transport et/ou de stockage d'objets radioactifs dégageant de la chaleur

Publication

EP 1103984 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99111839 A

Priority

EP 99111839 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2311236A1] A transport and/or storage container for radioactive heatevolving elements comprising at least one lid, a bottom, a jacket and an interior. The container jacket comprises an inner jacket bounding the interior of the container and an outer jacket disposed at a distance from the inner jacket. The space formed between the inner jacket and the outer jacket is filled with a filler. The inner jacket is connected to the outer jacket via heat-dissipating metal elements. One end of each metal element is firmly connected to the inner jacket or to the outer jacket and the other end bears against the respective opposite inner jacket or outer jacket under prestress, thus forming heat-conducting contact.

Abstract (de)

Transport- und/oder Lagerbehälter für radioaktive wärmeentwickelnde Elemente, - mit zumindest einem Behälterdeckel, Behälterboden, Behältermantel und Behälterinnenraum. Der Behältermantel besteht aus einem den Behälterinnenraum begrenzenden Innenmantel sowie einem mit Abstand zu dem Innenmantel angeordneten Außenmantel. Der zwischen Innenmantel und Außenmantel ausgebildete Zwischenraum ist mit einem Füllstoff gefüllt. Der Innenmantel ist mit dem Außenmantel über wärmeableitende Metallelemente verbunden. Die Metallelemente sind jeweils mit einem einen Ende mit dem Innenmantel oder mit dem Außenmantel fest verbunden und liegen mit ihrem anderen Ende an dem jeweils gegenüberliegenden Innenmantel oder Außenmantel unter vorspannung und somit unter Ausbildung eines wärmeleitenden Kontaktes an. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21F 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21C 19/32 (2006.01); G21C 19/06 (2006.01); G21F 5/008 (2006.01); G21F 5/10 (2006.01); G21F 5/14 (2006.01); G21F 9/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21F 5/10 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/201 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/302 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/60 (2013.01); G21Y 2004/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103984 A1 20010530; EP 1103984 B1 20020918; BG 104523 A 20010928; CA 2311236 A1 20001219; CN 1311510 A 20010905; DE 59902780 D1 20021024; EA 002230 B1 20020228; EA 200000533 A2 20001225; EA 200000533 A3 20010423; ES 2181339 T3 20030216; JP 2001027691 A 20010130; KR 20010066832 A 20010711; SK 8902000 A3 20010510; TW 513728 B 20021211; US 6389093 B1 20020514

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2005-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040621

2005-06-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050619

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-25 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040619

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-02-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040619

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040621

2004-06-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040619

2004-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: G.- FUR NUKLEAR-BEHALTER M.B.H. *GNB

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-05-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030521

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030520

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030516

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030516

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030514

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181339 T3

2002-11-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021014

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902780 20021024

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000420

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-02-20 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000420

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010917

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991022

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT PAYMENT 20000420;LV;MK;RO;SI