Global Patent Index - EP 1103985 A2

EP 1103985 A2 2001-05-30 - Optical focusing device and measuring system

Title (en)

Optical focusing device and measuring system

Title (de)

Optisches Fokussierelement und Messsystem

Title (fr)

Dispositif optique de focalisation et équipement de mesure

Publication

EP 1103985 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00125565 A

Priority

DE 19956782 A

Abstract (en)

Optical element for focusing electromagnetic radiation comprises a zone plate (30) with ring zones which are permeable to radiation and ring zones which are impermeable to radiation. The ring zones of the zone plate permeable to the radiation are partially impermeable to the radiation. Independent claims are also included for (1) A measuring system comprising the optical element (30), a radiation source (20) and a detector (40); and (2) A device for changing the physical, chemical and/or biological properties of a region of a sample.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein optisches Element zur Fokussierung von elektromagnetischen Strahlen (20, 21) oder Strahlen von Elementarteilchen, insbesondere von Röntgenstrahlen, umfassend eine Fresnelsche Zonenplatte (30) mit Ringzonen, die durchlässig für die Strahlen (20, 21) sind und Ringzonen, die für die Strahlen (20, 21) un-durchlässig sind und ferner ein Meßsystem, insbesondere zum Vermessen von inneren Bereichen dreidimensionaler Proben mit hoher Ortsauflösung und einer Apparatur zur Veränderung der physikalischen, chemischen und/oder biologischen Eigenschaften eines Bereichs einer Probe, insbesondere eines Innenbereichs einer Probe. Die Erfindung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß das optische Element dadurch weitergebildet ist, daß die für die Strahlen (20, 21) durchlässigen Ringzonen der Fresnelschen Zonenplatte (30) teilweise für die Strahlen (20, 21) undurchlässig sind. Die Erfindung zeichnet sich ferner dadurch aus. daß das Meßsystem und die Apparatur zur Veränderung der Eigenschaften eines Bereichs einer Probe wenigstens ein entsprechendes optisches Element umfassen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21K 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21K 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21K 1/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103985 A2 20010530; EP 1103985 A3 20030409; DE 19956782 A1 20010628; DE 19956782 C2 20011115

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031010

2004-02-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 21K 1/06 A

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 21K 1/02 B

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI