Global Patent Index - EP 1103988 A2

EP 1103988 A2 2001-05-30 - SEmi-capacitance graded bushing insulator of the type with insulating gas filling, such as SF6

Title (en)

SEmi-capacitance graded bushing insulator of the type with insulating gas filling, such as SF6

Title (de)

Durchführungsisolator mit Halbkapazitätsgradienten und mit Isoliergasfüllung, wie SF6

Title (fr)

Traversée - isolateur, calibrée à semi-capacité, remplie de gaz isolant, comme le SF6

Publication

EP 1103988 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00107732 A

Priority

IT MI992481 A

Abstract (en)

A semi-capacitance graded bushing comprises a conductor (1) fixed in the upper part to a plate (2) of the head (3) and in the lower part by way of a movable contact (4) to the fixed electrode (5) of the gas-insulated bus-duct (6), an insulating capacitance body (7) formed by a winding of insulating material in which are inserted the conductive or semiconductive foils (8), and a tube (9) which is prolonged with respect to the insulating capacitance body (7) to function as an electrode which is duly screened with end rings (10), the insulating capacitance body (7) being supported by the flange (11) which is fixed with respect to the external porcelain (12) by way of a cemented collar (13). A glass fibre-reinforced resin tube (14) is disposed in the interior of the porcelain (12). The whole assembly is filled with insulating gas under pressure, generally SF6. The capacitance, having as armatures the conductor (1) and the electrode (9) and as dielectric the gas, is in cascade relationship with the capacitance of the insulating capacitance body (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 17/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 17/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 17/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103988 A2 20010530; EP 1103988 A3 20020102; EP 1103988 B1 20051130; DE 60024399 D1 20060105; DE 60024399 T2 20060817; IT 1313854 B1 20020924; IT MI992481 A1 20010528; IT MI992481 D0 19991126

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-09-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM GRID S.P.A., NOVENTA DI PIAVE, IT

- Document: DE 60024399

- Effective date: 20130807

2013-09-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60024399

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FREISCHEM, DE

- Effective date: 20130807

2013-09-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60024399

- Representative's name: FREISCHEM & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20130807

2013-08-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60024399

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FREISCHEM, DE

2013-03-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM GRID S.P.A., IT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PASSONI E VILLA FABBRICA ISOLATORI E CONDENSATORI S.P.A., MAILAND/MILANO, IT

- Document: DE 60024399

- Effective date: 20130123

2013-03-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PASSONI E VILLA FABBRICA ISOLATORI E CONDENSATORI S.P.A., MAILAND/MILANO, IT

- Document: DE 60024399

- Effective date: 20130123

2013-03-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60024399

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FREISCHEM, DE

- Effective date: 20130123

2013-03-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60024399

- Representative's name: FREISCHEM & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20130123

2013-01-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60024399

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FREISCHEM, DE

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051130

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070119

2007-01-19 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060411

2006-11-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-04-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060411

2006-01-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60024399 P 20060105

2005-11-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2005-11-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041206

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB SE

2002-03-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020109

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI