Global Patent Index - EP 1103989 A2

EP 1103989 A2 2001-05-30 - Direct-current electromagnet for switching apparatus

Title (en)

Direct-current electromagnet for switching apparatus

Title (de)

Gleichstromelektromagnet für Schaltgerät

Title (fr)

Electro-aimant à courant continu pour appareil interrupteur

Publication

EP 1103989 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00403306 A

Priority

FR 9915174 A

Abstract (en)

The relay coil (4) operates a spring loaded armature (5) which actuates circuit breaker contacts (P) through a linkage (9a,L). In the coil de-energized state the magnetic circuit includes permanent magnets but these are by-passed when the coil is energized. The fixed and moving parts of the magnetic circuit are built up from laminations which have greater width at fixing points

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un électro-aimant à courant continu pour appareil interrupteur, comprenant une bobine d'induction (4) coopérant avec un circuit magnétique constitué d'une partie fixe (11, 12) et d'une partie mobile (5) et caractérisé par le fait que l'une au moins des parties (11, 12, 5) du circuit magnétique est constituée par un empilage de tôles découpées (111, 112, 531, 521, 512) et assemblées les unes aux autres et présentant une hauteur variable, par endroits faible, plus forte au niveau de moyens d'assemblage mécanique (112, 512, 522). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 3/02; H01F 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/08 (2006.01); H01F 7/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/1623 (2013.01); H01F 7/081 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103989 A2 20010530; EP 1103989 A3 20020508; EP 1103989 B1 20080312; DE 60038274 D1 20080424; DE 60038274 T2 20090319; ES 2300250 T3 20080616; FR 2801721 A1 20010601; FR 2801721 B1 20020118

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171005

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-17 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 60038274

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101124

2012-01-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120110

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101123

2011-09-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101124

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101123

2011-06-28 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091110

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091021

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081215

2008-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2300250 T3

2008-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60038274 P 20080424

2008-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB SE

2008-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070411

2003-01-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB SE

2002-08-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020603

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRONIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI