Global Patent Index - EP 1103996 A1

EP 1103996 A1 2001-05-30 - Device for switching for an interrupting apparatus

Title (en)

Device for switching for an interrupting apparatus

Title (de)

Abschaltvorrichtung für ein Schaltgerät

Title (fr)

Dispositif de coupure pour appareil interrupteur

Publication

EP 1103996 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00403260 A

Priority

FR 9914960 A

Abstract (en)

The multipolar switch has a container (20) with contact break chambers (19) and side walls (24). The side walls have end guide sections (16a) of extrusion arc protrusions (16) ensuring electrical isolation between the moving contacts and the extinction arc protrusions.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un dispositif de coupure d'appareil interrupteur multipolaire constitué, pour chaque pôle, d'un boîtier (20) d'une chambre de coupure (19) comprenant deux parois latérales (24) entre lesquelles est disposée une cage (10) supportant un pont (11) de deux contacts mobiles (12) associés à des contacts fixes, ainsi que deux ensembles de plusieurs ailettes d'extinction d'arc (16). Les parois latérales (24) comportent des moyens de guidage constitués d'un corps (21), moulé avec chaque paroi latérale (24) vers l'intérieur du boîtier de coupure (20) et prolongé d'une nervure latérale (22) formant, avec la paroi latérale (24), un logement (23) pouvant recevoir les extrémités (16a) des d'ailettes d'extinction d'arc. Ces moyens de guidage assurent en plus une isolation électrique entre les contacts mobiles (12) et les extrémités (16a) des ailettes d'extinction d'arc et contribuent également à renforcer la rigidité mécanique des parois latérales (24) du boîtier de coupure dans la zone où se déclenche un arc électrique entre contacts fixes et contacts mobiles. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/362 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103996 A1 20010530; EP 1103996 B1 20060510; EP 1103996 B2 20130814; AT 326060 T 20060615; DE 60027842 D1 20060614; DE 60027842 T2 20061005; DE 60027842 T3 20131212; FR 2801722 A1 20010601; FR 2801722 B1 20011228

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171115

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171005

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171006

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-17 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 60027842

2017-10-06 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-05 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-10 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 60027842

- Effective date: 20130814

2013-08-14 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20130814

2013-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2013-08-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2013-03-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20070209

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060510

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061122

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060510

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060811

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-03-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, BERLIN UND MUENCHEN

- Effective date: 20070209

2006-12-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-10-10 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061010

2006-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060814

2006-08-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060821

2006-08-10 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-08-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-06-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2006-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60027842 P 20060614

2006-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-05-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060510

2006-05-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060510

2006-05-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060510

2006-05-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060510

2006-05-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060510

2006-02-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DUCHEMIN, JEAN-PIERRE

2006-02-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DRUELLE, VINCENT

2002-08-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRONIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-07-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DUCHEMIN, JEAN PIERRE

2001-07-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DRUELLE, VINCENT

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI