Global Patent Index - EP 1104001 A2

EP 1104001 A2 2001-05-30 - Flat cathode ray tube and picture display device using the same

Title (en)

Flat cathode ray tube and picture display device using the same

Title (de)

Flache Kathodenstrahlröhre und sie benutzende Bildwiedergabeanordnung

Title (fr)

Tube à rayons cathodiques plat et dispositif de reproduction d'images utilisant ce tube

Publication

EP 1104001 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00403293 A

Priority

  • JP 33347299 A
  • JP 2000061859 A

Abstract (en)

A flat cathode ray tube (CRT) capable of producing clear pictures and a picture display device using the flat CRT. A light-attenuation film (17) having a light-attenuating action is attached to the front surface of a front panel (12). The quantity of light of an extraneous ray passing into the front panel (12) is reduced by the light-attenuation film (17) when passing through the front panel (12) and when reflected by a phosphor layer. The quantity of light of a ray for picture formation is also reduced by the light-attenuation film (17). However, the quantity of light reduced in the case of the ray for picture formation is smaller relatively to that of the extraneous ray. Thus, a picture observed becomes clearer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 29/89

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/88 (2006.01); G09F 9/00 (2006.01); H01J 29/89 (2006.01); H01J 31/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/896 (2013.01); H01J 2229/88 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1104001 A2 20010530; EP 1104001 A3 20031119; CN 1299149 A 20010613; JP 2001216924 A 20010810; KR 20010051901 A 20010625; TW 535189 B 20030601

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040520

2004-09-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI