Global Patent Index - EP 1104005 A1

EP 1104005 A1 2001-05-30 - Gas discharge lamp having an oxide emitter electrode

Title (en)

Gas discharge lamp having an oxide emitter electrode

Title (de)

Gasentladungslampe mit Oxidemitter-Elektrode

Title (fr)

Lampe à décharge à gaz à électrode pourvue d'une couche émettrice à oxyde

Publication

EP 1104005 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00204015 A

Priority

DE 19956322 A

Abstract (en)

Gas discharge lamp comprises an electrode having a support made of an electrode metal and a first electrode coating made of an electron emitting coating consisting of a metal powder preparation of a powder of a reducing metal selected from aluminum, silicon, titanium, zirconium, hafnium, tantalum, molybdenum, tungsten and their alloys with a powder coating of a precious metal selected from rhenium, cobalt, nickel, ruthenium, palladium, rhodium, iridium and platinum and their alloys and an alkaline earth metal oxide, selected from barium oxide, calcium oxide and strontium oxide.

Abstract (de)

Eine Gasentladungslampe, insbesondere eine Niederdruckgasentladungslampe, ausgerüstet mit einer Elektrode, die einen Träger aus einem Elektrodenmetall und eine erste Elektrodenbeschichtung aus einem elektronenemittierenden Material, das eine Metallpulverzubereitung aus einem Pulver eines reduzierenden Metalls, ausgewählt aus der Gruppe Aluminium, Silicium, Titan, Zirkon, Hafnium, Tantal, Molybdän, Wolfram und deren Legierungen, mit einer Pulverbeschichtung mit einem Edelmetall ausgewählt aus der Gruppe Rhenium, Kobalt, Nickel, Ruthenium, Palladium, Rhodium, Iridium und Platin und deren Legierungen, und mindestens ein Erdalkalimetalloxid, ausgewählt aus der Gruppe Calciumoxid, Strontiumoxid und Bariumoxid, umfaßt, zeichnet sich durch einen gleichmäßigen Emissionsstrom und eine lange Lebensdauer aus. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/06; H01J 1/142

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/06 (2006.01); H01J 61/067 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/06 (2013.01); H01J 61/0677 (2013.01); H01J 61/0675 (2013.01); H01J 61/0735 (2013.01); H01J 61/0737 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1104005 A1 20010530; EP 1104005 B1 20061220; DE 19956322 A1 20010531; DE 50013884 D1 20070201; JP 2001155679 A 20010608; US 6674240 B1 20040106

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071114

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061220

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071114

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070810

2007-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070921

2007-08-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-02-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013884 P 20070201

2006-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-12-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI