Global Patent Index - EP 1104025 A1

EP 1104025 A1 2001-05-30 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE

Title (en)

SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE

Title (de)

HALBLEITERVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR

Publication

EP 1104025 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99918362 A

Priority

JP 9902417 W

Abstract (en)

A semiconductor device including (a) a base plate, (b) an insulation substrate that consists of an insulator plate with a front electrode and a back electrode bonded thereon and is fixed onto the base plate via the back electrode, (c) a semiconductor element fastened onto the insulation substrate via the front electrode, (d) an insulating cover that covers the semiconductor element and (e) electrodes that are led from the semiconductor element to the outside of the insulating cover. The back electrode is larger than the insulator plate, the base plate has a through hole that is smaller than the back electrode and larger than the insulator plate. The insulation substrate is positioned in the through hole and is fastened onto the back surface of the base plate via the periphery of the back electrode. Since the insulation substrate makes direct contact with the heat sink without the base plate intervening therebetween, thermal resistance between the semiconductor element and the heat sink is decreased. Also since bending stress to be generated in the insulator plate when fastening the heat sink onto the base plate by screwing is mitigated by the back electrode, dielectric breakdown in the semiconductor device due to cracks in the insulator plate can be restrained from taking place. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 23/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 23/053 (2006.01); H01L 25/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 23/053 (2013.01); H01L 25/072 (2013.01); H01L 24/45 (2013.01); H01L 24/48 (2013.01); H01L 2224/45124 (2013.01); H01L 2224/48091 (2013.01); H01L 2224/48227 (2013.01); H01L 2224/73265 (2013.01); H01L 2924/12041 (2013.01); H01L 2924/181 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. H01L 2224/48091 + H01L 2924/00014
  2. H01L 2924/12041 + H01L 2924/00
  3. H01L 2224/45124 + H01L 2924/00014
  4. H01L 2224/45124 + H01L 2924/00015
  5. H01L 2924/181 + H01L 2924/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1104025 A1 20010530; EP 1104025 A4 20070502; EP 1104025 B1 20071212; DE 69937739 D1 20080124; DE 69937739 T2 20081127; JP 3610015 B2 20050112; US 2001002051 A1 20010531; US 6369411 B2 20020409; WO 0068992 A1 20001116

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170502

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140509

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-06 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 69937739

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080511

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080511

2008-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080915

2008-08-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-06-25 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071212

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071212

2008-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69937739 P 20080124

2007-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2007-12-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MATSUMOTO, HIDEO,C/O MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.

2007-05-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070201

2007-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 23/053 20060101AFI20070126BHEP

2007-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 25/07 20060101ALI20070126BHEP

2006-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010209

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI