Global Patent Index - EP 1104052 A1

EP 1104052 A1 2001-05-30 - Commutator for an electrical Rotationalmachine

Title (en)

Commutator for an electrical Rotationalmachine

Title (de)

Kommutator für eine elektrische Rotationsmaschine

Title (fr)

Commutateur pour une machine rotative électrique

Publication

EP 1104052 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00125763 A

Priority

DE 19956512 A

Abstract (en)

Commutators for electric rotational machines, such as series-wound motors of IC engine starters, include a shaft (3) housed in a sleeve with an electrically insulating part for the commutator segments, which are connected to the windings of the rotating part and are subject to centrifugal forces during operation of the machine, which vary in intensity depending on the revs and weight of the commutator. The commutator segments (7) are protected by at least one reinforcement element (8) and are thus retained on the insulating part (4). Each commutator segment (7) comprises a lower part (9) and an upper part (10) positioned on the insulating part (4).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Kommutator für eine elektrische Rotationsmaschine, mit einer Wellenaufnahme, einem die Wellenaufnahme umgebenden Isolierteil und mit mehreren Kommutatorlamellen, die an dem Isolierteil angebracht sind, der sich dadurch auszeichnet, dass die Kommutatorlamellen (7) von zumindest einem Armierungselement (8) umgriffen und so auf dem Isolierteil (4) gehalten sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 39/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 39/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 39/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1104052 A1 20010530; DE 19956512 A1 20010621

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011201

2002-04-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-03-06 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2002-03-06 [DBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (DELETED)

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI