Global Patent Index - EP 1104061 A2

EP 1104061 A2 2001-05-30 - Semiconductor laser array and optical scanner

Title (en)

Semiconductor laser array and optical scanner

Title (de)

Halbleiterlaserfeld und optischer Abtaster

Title (fr)

Réseau laser à semiconducteur et balayeur optique

Publication

EP 1104061 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00126100 A

Priority

JP 33844999 A

Abstract (en)

A semiconductor laser array comprises a chip having a plurality of luminous spots and a mount for mounting the chip by means of solder. The plurality of luminous spots project toward the laser beam emitting side from the corresponding end facet of the mount. The semiconductor laser array is typically used as light source of an optical scanner for laser beam printers or copying machines. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01S 5/40; G06K 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 1/036 (2006.01); B41J 2/44 (2006.01); H01S 5/022 (2006.01); H01S 5/40 (2006.01); H01S 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01S 5/02272 (2013.01); H01S 5/4031 (2013.01); H01S 5/0224 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1104061 A2 20010530; EP 1104061 A3 20021113; EP 1104061 B1 20060301; DE 60026220 D1 20060427; DE 60026220 T2 20061116; JP 2001156379 A 20010608; US 6867796 B1 20050315

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161129

2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170601

2017-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161129

2017-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60026220

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131125

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061204

2006-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60026220 P 20060427

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-03-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-03-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060301

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030327

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI