Global Patent Index - EP 1104893 B1

EP 1104893 B1 2002-09-04 - Processing method providing cold blue-black image tone for black-and white materials having silver halide tabular gain emulsions

Title (en)

Processing method providing cold blue-black image tone for black-and white materials having silver halide tabular gain emulsions

Title (de)

Verarbeitungsverfahren, das einen kalten blauschwarzen Bildton in Schwarzweisssilberhalogenidmaterialien liefert

Title (fr)

Procédé de traitement fournissant un ton de l'image noir bleuâtre froid dans des matériaux photographiques noir et blanc à l'halogénure d'argent

Publication

EP 1104893 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 00203915 A

Priority

  • EP 00203915 A
  • EP 99204007 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1104893A1] A method has been described for processing an exposed black-and-white silver halide photographic film material comprising in a hydrophilic light-sensitive layer thereof a binder and silver halide grains being ä111ü or ä100ü tabular silver bromo(chloro)iodide or silver chloro(bromo)iodide grains having an average aspect ratio of from 1.2 to 50 and having a silver iodide content of less than 3 mole % based on silver with at least part of it at their grain surface, said method comprising the steps of developing in a developer, fixing in a fixer, rinsing and drying, characterized in that in said developing step the developer comprises an alkali soluble agent having preventing silver dissolution properties, being a mercapto azole compound as presented herein.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 5/305

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/305 (2006.01); G03C 1/005 (2006.01); G03C 5/17 (2006.01); G03C 5/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/305 (2013.01); G03C 1/0051 (2013.01); G03C 5/17 (2013.01); G03C 5/30 (2013.01); G03C 2001/03535 (2013.01); G03C 2001/03558 (2013.01); G03C 2005/3007 (2013.01); G03C 2200/01 (2013.01); G03C 2200/03 (2013.01); G03C 2200/34 (2013.01); G03C 2200/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1104893 A1 20010606; EP 1104893 B1 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081107

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081107

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071018

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-04-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-12-05 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021205

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000401 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020311

2002-02-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011206

2001-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-06-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI