Global Patent Index - EP 1105222 B1

EP 1105222 B1 2002-11-27 - DEVICE FOR SEPARATING MIXTURES OF VALUABLE SUBSTANCES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR SEPARATING MIXTURES OF VALUABLE SUBSTANCES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR TRENNUNG VON WERTSTOFFGEMISCHEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE TRIER DES MELANGES DE MATERIAUX DE VALEUR

Publication

EP 1105222 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99922125 A

Priority

  • DE 19836344 A
  • DE 29818198 U
  • EP 9902779 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6394280B1] A device for removing flat materials from a mixture of valuable substances comprises a conveyor (1) on which the substance mixture is conveyed, and an extractor for extracting flat materials from the substance mixture in an extraction zone. The extractor comprises extracting prongs (4) which are provided on a revolving transporter (3) which is deflected at least at two points of deflection, with the materials which have been picked up being discharged in a discharge zone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 13/00; B07B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 4/02 (2006.01); B07B 7/01 (2006.01); B07B 9/00 (2006.01); B07B 11/02 (2006.01); B07B 11/06 (2006.01); B07B 13/00 (2006.01); B07B 13/05 (2006.01); B07B 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07B 13/05 (2013.01); B07B 9/00 (2013.01); B07B 13/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

US 6394280 B1 20020528; AT 228398 T 20021215; EP 1105222 A1 20010613; EP 1105222 B1 20021127; JP 2002522220 A 20020723; WO 0009273 A1 20000224

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903567

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903567

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100421

2011-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100421

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100430

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090420

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903567 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228398 T 20021215

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010209

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT