Global Patent Index - EP 1105295 B1

EP 1105295 B1 2002-11-27 - DEVICE FOR POWDERING PRINTED SHEETS WITH THE AID OF AN ELECTROSTATIC CHARGE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR POWDERING PRINTED SHEETS WITH THE AID OF AN ELECTROSTATIC CHARGE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESTÄUBEN VON BEDRUCKTEN BOGEN UNTER ZUHILFENAHME EINER ELEKTROSTATISCHEN AUFLADUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE POUDRAGE DE FEUILLES IMPRIMEES A L'AIDE D'UNE CHARGE ELECTROSTATIQUE

Publication

EP 1105295 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99934658 A

Priority

  • DE 19836022 A
  • EP 9904864 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19836022A1] A device is described to dust printed sheets (4) of paper etc. by a powder dusting device (8) which is located inside a sheet delivery device (1). A charging-up device (11) for electrostatic charging is assigned to the sheet. The charging-up device is provided outside the paper delivery device at a location before the sheet enters into the delivery device. The charging-up device is designed as a charging bar. One or more ionization bars (18) are wired in front of the charging bar. It is located in the direct neighborhood of the printed side of the sheet and provided in the region of the last counter-pressure roller (seen in the transport direction) of a rotational printing press.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 5/08 (2006.01); B41F 23/06 (2006.01); B05B 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/06 (2013.01); B05B 5/08 (2013.01); B05B 7/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19836022 A1 20000217; EP 1105295 A1 20010613; EP 1105295 B1 20021127; JP 2002522277 A 20020723; US 6648972 B1 20031118; WO 0009337 A1 20000224

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903568

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-07-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050710

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1105295E

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-02-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030113

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903568 20030109

2003-01-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020204

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001227

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE