Global Patent Index - EP 1105325 B1

EP 1105325 B1 2002-12-04 - CIGARETTE PACKET

Title (en)

CIGARETTE PACKET

Title (de)

ZIGARETTENPACKUNG

Title (fr)

PAQUET DE CIGARETTES

Publication

EP 1105325 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99941471 A

Priority

  • DE 19836940 A
  • EP 9905397 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19836940A1] An opening(25) which is closed off by a flap(24) is formed in the lower region of the box section(11) or in the region of the bottom(17). The opening as well as the flap extends by one section inside the box rear wall(14) and by another section inside the bottom. The flap, which in cross section is angular in form, is hinged on the rear wall by one side(26) and by the other side(27) in the region of the bottom. The flap is defined by a weakened line or stamped line(33) inside the blank produced for the packet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 85/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/44 (2006.01); B65D 5/54 (2006.01); B65D 5/66 (2006.01); B65D 85/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/1081 (2013.01); Y10S 206/831 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19836940 A1 20000224; AU 5507399 A 20000314; CN 1123508 C 20031008; CN 1312766 A 20010912; EP 1105325 A1 20010613; EP 1105325 B1 20021204; ID 27917 A 20010503; JP 2002523306 A 20020730; JP 4176964 B2 20081105; US 2001004967 A1 20010628; US 6412630 B2 20020702; WO 0010891 A1 20000302

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903672

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140728

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140728

2015-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140728

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140730

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-02-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140201

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130718

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130724

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120710

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110712

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903672 20030116

2003-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FOCKE, HEINZ

2002-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BUSE, HENRY

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010705

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010109

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE