Global Patent Index - EP 1105642 B1

EP 1105642 B1 2002-12-11 - METHOD FOR THE STARTER CUT-OUT OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE STARTER CUT-OUT OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR STARTABSCHALTUNG EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR ARRETER LE DEMARRAGE D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1105642 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98942474 A

Priority

DE 9801815 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0001943A1] The invention relates to a method for the starter cut-out of an internal combustion engine, according to which a starter motor which can mesh with the internal combustion engine for starting same is disengaged and switched off when the internal combustion engine runs autonomously. The instant of starter cut-out is determined from a characteristic of a starter current of the starter motor. According to the invention a signal proportional to the starter current (IS) is evaluated to determine the instant (tA) of starter cut-out. A characteristic curve is evaluated with a signal that is proportional to the starter current, which curve depends on an operating state of the internal combustion engine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/0848 (2013.01); F02N 2200/044 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0001943 A1 20000113; EP 1105642 A1 20010613; EP 1105642 B1 20021211; JP 2002519587 A 20020702; JP 4469498 B2 20100526; US 6363899 B1 20020402

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SEG AUTOMOTIVE GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20180315

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070726

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030627

2003-06-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021211

2003-03-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT SE

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020226

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010201

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT SE