Global Patent Index - EP 1105691 B1

EP 1105691 B1 2002-11-27 - HEAT EXCHANGER WITH A CONNECTING ELEMENT

Title (en)

HEAT EXCHANGER WITH A CONNECTING ELEMENT

Title (de)

WÄRMETAUSCHER MIT EINEM ANSCHLUSSELEMENT

Title (fr)

ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR COMPORTANT UN ELEMENT DE RACCORDEMENT

Publication

EP 1105691 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99923560 A

Priority

  • DE 19837807 A
  • EP 9903167 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19837807A1] The heat exchanger (10) has at least one inlet (15) and one outlet (16) for the fluid to be cooled together with at least one coolant inlet (13) and coolant outlet (14). Connecting devices are provided for the fluid circuits and consist at least partly of holding devices which are completely part of the heat exchanger, being particularly formed by the end plates (18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 9/005 (2013.01); F28F 9/0246 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0089 (2013.01); F28F 2275/122 (2013.01); F28F 2275/146 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19837807 A1 20000224; BR 9915140 A 20010717; EP 1105691 A1 20010613; EP 1105691 B1 20021127; US 6435271 B1 20020820; WO 0011425 A1 20000302

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2006-05-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FILTERWERK *MANN & HUMMEL G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-09-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-05-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021127

2003-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-02-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903569 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-07-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HEAT EXCHANGER WITH A CONNECTING ELEMENT

2002-07-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HEAT EXCHANGER WITH A CONNECTING ELEMENT

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010129

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE