Global Patent Index - EP 1105898 B1

EP 1105898 B1 2002-09-18 - HIGH-VOLTAGE CIRCUIT BREAKER WITH INTERRUPTER UNIT

Title (en)

HIGH-VOLTAGE CIRCUIT BREAKER WITH INTERRUPTER UNIT

Title (de)

HOCHSPANNUNGSLEISTUNGSSCHALTER MIT EINER UNTERBRECHEREINHEIT

Title (fr)

SECTIONNEUR DE PUISSANCE HAUTE TENSION POURVU D'UNE UNITE DISJONCTEUR

Publication

EP 1105898 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99945882 A

Priority

  • DE 9902031 W
  • DE 19832709 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19832709A1] A high voltage circuit breaker, comprising a baffle system for diverting arc quenching gas radially outwards by more than 90 deg after use, is new. A high voltage circuit breaker, enclosed by a quenching gas-filled housing (16), has a blowing system (5,6) for blowing quenching gas at an arc between the two arcing contacts (1,2) of an interrupter unit, the gas subsequently flowing away in the axial direction of the contacts and a baffle system (9,10,11) being provided in the flow away region. The novelty is that the baffle system diverts the quenching gas stream radially outwards by more than 90 deg .

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/70 (2006.01); H01H 33/915 (2006.01); H01H 33/91 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/7015 (2013.01); H01H 33/91 (2013.01); H01H 2033/888 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19832709 A1 20000127; DE 19832709 C2 20001207; DE 19832709 C5 20060511; EP 1105898 A1 20010613; EP 1105898 B1 20020918; US 6717791 B1 20040406; WO 0004565 A1 20000127

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902781

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120711

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120820

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110914

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2005-06-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050607

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-23 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20040906

2003-08-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ABB SCHWEIZ AG

- Effective date: 20030617

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021126

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902781 20021024

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI