Global Patent Index - EP 1105990 A4

EP 1105990 A4 2001-12-05 - METHOD AND APPARATUS IN A MESSAGING SYSTEM FOR LIMITING AN ACCUMULATION OF MESSAGES

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS IN A MESSAGING SYSTEM FOR LIMITING AN ACCUMULATION OF MESSAGES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG IN EINEM MITTEILUNGSSYSTEM ZUR BEGRENZUNG VON ANHÄUFUNG VON MITTEILUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DANS UN SYSTEME DE MESSAGERIE DESTINE A LIMITER UNE ACCUMULATION DE MESSAGES

Publication

EP 1105990 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99935642 A

Priority

  • US 9916156 W
  • US 13562798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0011821A1] A maximum accumulation allowed is defined (302) for messages associated with at least one of a source of the messages and a recipient of the messages. A processing system (210) determines (306) a current accumulation of the messages associated with the at least one of the source and the recipient. The processing system stops (312) further accumulation when the current accumulation reaches the maximum accumulation allowed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04J 3/16; H04J 3/22; H04Q 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 88/18 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 88/185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0011821 A1 20000302; CN 1311929 A 20010905; EP 1105990 A1 20010613; EP 1105990 A4 20011205

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-11-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030110

2001-12-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011019

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04J 3/16 A, 7H 04J 3/22 B, 7H 04Q 7/10 B

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010319

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE