Global Patent Index - EP 1106274 A3

EP 1106274 A3 2002-12-18 - FORMPIECE OF NON-UNIFORM THICKNES AND METHOD OF MAKING

Title (en)

FORMPIECE OF NON-UNIFORM THICKNES AND METHOD OF MAKING

Title (de)

Formbauteil ungleichmässiger Dicke und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

PIECE D'EPAISSEUR NON-UNIFORME EN PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1106274 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00125861 A

Priority

DE 19957910 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1106274A2] The molded component producing process involves passing at least two sheets (3, 4) which at least partly overlap between at least one rotating first roller (1) and at least one rotating second roller (2) opposite the first one. The sheets are deformed together between the rollers and are also bonded to each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 5/08; B21D 39/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 47/04 (2006.01); B21D 5/08 (2006.01); B21D 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 35/006 (2013.01); B21D 5/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1106274 A2 20010613; EP 1106274 A3 20021218; CZ 20004449 A3 20010912; DE 19957910 A1 20010613

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041209

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040129

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030314

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21D 5/08 A, 7B 21D 39/03 B

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI