Global Patent Index - EP 1106316 A3

EP 1106316 A3 2002-11-20 - Transportable mixer

Title (en)

Transportable mixer

Title (de)

Fahrmischer

Title (fr)

Mélangeur mobile

Publication

EP 1106316 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00120557 A

Priority

  • DE 29921418 U
  • DE 29922441 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1106316A2] The rotating mixing drum (1) may be mounted on the chassis frame of a road vehicle. It has an open end (2) through which the contents may be poured. A funnel (3) may be fitted onto the open end, through which the contents may be poured into an adjustable chute (4) which directs the material to where it is needed. The swiveling support for the chute may be a single arm (6) on a hinge (7) with a vertical axis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28C 5/42; B28C 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28C 5/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28C 5/4248 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1106316 A2 20010613; EP 1106316 A3 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041105

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030729

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FR GB NL

2003-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030331

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI