Global Patent Index - EP 1106317 A3

EP 1106317 A3 2002-11-20 - Mixing drum

Title (en)

Mixing drum

Title (de)

Mischertrommel

Title (fr)

Tambour mélangeur

Publication

EP 1106317 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00120558 A

Priority

DE 29921258 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1106317A2] Mixing drum (1) for mixers comprises an outlet (4) on one side of the mixing drum and a dripping device around the outlet having two collar-like drip rings (5, 6) connected to each other. Preferred Features: The drip rings have different orientations, especially V-shaped.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28C 5/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28C 5/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28C 5/4203 (2013.01); B28C 5/4268 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29921258 U1 20010412; EP 1106317 A2 20010613; EP 1106317 A3 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041105

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030729

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030409

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI