Global Patent Index - EP 1106351 A3

EP 1106351 A3 2002-09-25 - Device for controlling a printing machine, particularly for a sheet-fed offset printing machine

Title (en)

Device for controlling a printing machine, particularly for a sheet-fed offset printing machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Steuerung einer Druckmaschine, insbesondere einer Bogenoffsetdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande d'une machine d'impression, notamment pour une machine d'impression offset à feuille

Publication

EP 1106351 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00125875 A

Priority

DE 29921716 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1106351A2] The arrangement has a controller that feeds a drive signal to a control element (91-93) to achieve a predefined position depending on the current position of the control element. After detecting a fault by the control unit, the current control element position is set manually, whereby the manually set position of the control element is treated as equal to the position defined by the control unit for further printing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 21/00; B41F 33/00; B65H 43/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/00 (2006.01); B65H 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 43/00 (2013.01); B41F 33/00 (2013.01); B65H 2511/20 (2013.01); B65H 2511/52 (2013.01); B65H 2551/00 (2013.01); B65H 2551/20 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/20 + B65H 2220/02 + B65H 2220/11
  2. B65H 2511/52 + B65H 2220/01

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 29921716 U1 20000224; AT 266525 T 20040515; EP 1106351 A2 20010613; EP 1106351 A3 20020925; EP 1106351 B1 20040512

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071125

2006-11-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-11-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20061113

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-12-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-11-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006395 P 20040617

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-05-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-05-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030317

2002-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020816

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41F 21/00 A, 7B 41F 33/00 B, 7B 65H 43/00 B

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI